This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 03:10:47 (UTC).

APE Auto Glass LLC vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/17/2022 APE Auto Glass LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7284

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APE Auto Glass LLC

111 Bayside Drive

Clearwater, FL 33767

DIAZ, JORGE

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/17/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/17/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/07/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022529875; Judge: Murphy, J. Logan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: APE Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM