This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:29:16 (UTC).

ANTHONY LACHETTE - Estate

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 ANTHONY LACHETTE - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Pomponio, A. Denise and Pomponio, Denise. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2858

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Pomponio, A. Denise

Pomponio, Denise. A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner

TUOHEY, CAROLYN A

Aston, PA 19014

Decedent

LACHETTE, ANTHONY EDWARD

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

CHAVERNAY , MARLA E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE R. BREZINA, JR. PA

1218 Oakfield Dr

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 412View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ATTY LTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCOMMISSION; Comment: EXECUTED ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCOMMISSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ATTY LTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Comment: FROM JUDGE TO ATTY CHAVERNAY, DATED 8/5/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCOMMISSION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: CAROLYN A TUOHEY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF; Comment: COMMISSIONER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPET EST PROB LOST-DEST WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Comment: CAROLYN A TUOHEY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A; Petitioner: TUOHEY, CAROLYN A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less