This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/07/2019 at 12:21:07 (UTC).

ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA vs NUNN, TYREL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NUNN, TYREL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, E. Jared and Smith, Jared E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9495

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, E. Jared

Smith, Jared E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA

Tampa, FL 33613

Respondent

NUNN, TYREL

Unknown, FL 11111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • FILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE; Comment: 1vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • EVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: EDS # 190097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA; Respondent: NUNN, TYREL; Date Signed: 01/17/2019; Vol./Book: 26365, Page: 622, Number of Pages: 622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • EMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AMENDED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: NUNN, TYREL; Date Served: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: CANCEL TEMPORARY ORDER, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: NUNN, TYREL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • COURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • SHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • STAY AWAY FROM; Comment: DDSLAB; EXCELSIOR PREP CHARTER SCHOOL; 2156 UNIVERSITY SQUARE MALL #260-262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Domestic Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: ANKENY, AUDREY YAUNA; Respondent: NUNN, TYREL; Date Signed: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • EMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Amended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Temporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:45 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less