This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/31/2023 at 11:47:24 (UTC).

ANDERSON, EDWARD vs FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 ANDERSON, EDWARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6901

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, EDWARD

Defendant

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANTZIS , GEORGANNA ELENI

Defendant Attorney

MERCER , DAVID A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

05/08/2023: DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

ORDER

03/29/2023: ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/13/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/18/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

11/18/2022: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

10/06/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: OF RECORD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT; Comment: AMENDED DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.; Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD; Private Attorney: MERCER , DAVID A; Private Attorney: RITT , STEPHANIE WEBER; Date Signed: 05/08/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES ON 04/06/23 AT 1:00 PM 03/29/23 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.; Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD; Private Attorney: MERCER , DAVID A; Private Attorney: RITT , STEPHANIE WEBER; Date 2: 03/29/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 08/22/2022 DEFT FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS REQUEST NOT FILED sritt@forthepeople.com; mgregg@forthepeople.com; kmosher@forthepeople.com; Additional Info: Private Attorney: RITT , STEPHANIE WEBER;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ANDERSON, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less