Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 00:46:38 (UTC).

Anderson, Cecil vs Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Anderson, Cecil filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DePaul, Wendy. J, DePaul, J. Wendy and DePaul, Wendy J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5230

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DePaul, Wendy. J

DePaul, J. Wendy

DePaul, Wendy J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anderson, Cecil

Mobile, AL 36606

Respondent

Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

Ruskin, FL 33573

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TAYLOR , MARINA RUFFOLO

Attorney at MARINA TAYLOR P.A.

10605 Hackney Dr

Riverview, FL 33578

Respondent Attorney

GARCIA, CHRISTINA ANTON

Attorney at ANTON GARCIA LAW

106 S Tampania Ave

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 at 11:30 a.m.; Additional Info: Date Signed: 07/12/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 403 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Petitioner: Anderson, Cecil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketORDER (FAMILY); Comment: ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES; Additional Info: Date Signed: 06/25/2021; Judicial Officer: DePaul, Wendy J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; Comment: AND MOTION TO STAY SUBSEQUENTLY FILED PROCEEDING; Additional Info: Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION; Comment: TO DOMESTICATE AND ENFORCE OUT OF STATE CUSTODY DECREE; Additional Info: Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KENYETTA K. RUSSELL NEE GARRETT 04/29/2021; Additional Info: Private Attorney: TAYLOR , MARINA RUFFOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: FOR RESP; Additional Info: Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Anderson, Cecil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (Subsequent Filing); Additional Info: Private Attorney: TAYLOR , MARINA RUFFOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Child 1: Anderson, Chase; Petitioner: Anderson, Cecil; Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Child 1: Anderson, Chase; Petitioner: Anderson, Cecil; Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Child 1: Anderson, Chase; Petitioner: Anderson, Cecil; Respondent: Russell nee Garrett, Kenyetta K.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR , MARINA RUFFOLO