Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/01/2021 at 07:08:01 (UTC).

AmTrust North America of Florida vs The Smoke Shack, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 AmTrust North America of Florida filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Smoke Shack, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3266

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AmTrust North America of Florida

P.O. Box 650872

Dallas, TX 75265

Defendants

Suburban Propane

5618 Powhattan Avenue

Tampa, FL 33610

The Smoke Shack, LLC

3324 W. Gandy Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIOLI , FRANK JOSEPH, Jr

Attorney at SIOLI ALEXANDER PINO

9155 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorneys

BRADFORD , MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GO

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

BOLEN , DAVID R.

Attorney at WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY & FORD, P.A.

100 N Tampa St Ste 1800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/10/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/13/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

04/13/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DFDT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: The Smoke Shack, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Additional Info: Defendant: The Smoke Shack, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOT ATTACHED - PLTFF'S - UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DFDT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Suburban Propane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Suburban Propane

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: The Smoke Shack, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Suburban Propane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - FSioli@siolilaw.com ; dfernandez@siolilaw.com ; sapmail@siolilaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Suburban Propane; Defendant: The Smoke Shack, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2 - FSioli@siolilaw.com ; dfernandez@siolilaw.com ; sapmail@siolilaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: FSioli@siolilaw.com ; dfernandez@siolilaw.com ; sapmail@siolilaw.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AmTrust North America of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmTrust North America of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where The Smoke Shack, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Suburban Propane is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADFORD , MICHAEL JOSEPH