This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/15/2021 at 01:23:16 (UTC).

Ameripro Calibrations Llc, vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Ameripro Calibrations Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6956

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Calibrations Llc, D/B/A One Stop Calibration Of Florida A/A/O Sarah Hodge

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Hodge, Sarah

ONE STOP CALIBRATION OF FLORIDA

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

STUBBENDORFF , NIKLAS LARS

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/22/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Calibrations Llc,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONE STOP CALIBRATION OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT