This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:34:25 (UTC).

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc vs Permanent General Assurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Permanent General Assurance Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7552

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Willina Cody

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Cody, Willina

Defendant

Permanent General Assurance Corporation

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/03/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/03/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/03/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/18/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022355450; Judge: Lopez, Susan S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Permanent General Assurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Belinda Chambers is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT