This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 13:13:54 (UTC).

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4324

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Mark Smithee

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Smithee, Mark

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

HODGE , ASHLEY

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/24/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/18/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/18/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/18/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

02/23/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

03/04/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Private Attorney: HODGE , ASHLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Belinda Chambers is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT