This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 03/13/2022 at 20:38:45 (UTC).

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4311

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Hamza Naji

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Naji, Hamza

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

ROSANSKY, STEPHEN MICHAEL

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/03/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/03/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

OBJECTION

03/03/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/03/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/03/2022: OBJECTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/25/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/25/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/25/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: AND MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Belinda Chambers is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT