This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/04/2022 at 16:23:30 (UTC).

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc vs Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V., Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5118

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Christy Barnes

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Barnes, Christy

Defendant

Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

CLEVELAND , LAUREN MACKENZIE

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/01/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/22/2021: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

12/23/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/22/2021: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

01/03/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: CLEVELAND , LAUREN MACKENZIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Belinda Chambers is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT