This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 07:41:30 (UTC).

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3211

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Charles Mccollum

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

MCCOLLUM, CHARLES

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

DEL CUETO , NATALIE MARIE

Attorney at MS. NATALIE MARIE DEL CUETO

1231 Sw 132Nd Ct

Miami, FL 33184

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/21/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/08/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/08/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/21/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

06/30/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

06/30/2022: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameripro Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Belinda Chambers is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT