This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:16:08 (UTC).

Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC vs Nalley, Christopher

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nalley, Christopher. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel, Helene. L and Daniel, L. Helene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1887

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Daniel, Helene. L

Daniel, L. Helene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC

Defendants

Nalley, Audra O

Nalley, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUFFORD , CHARLES PORTER

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

03/03/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

03/03/2023: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

03/03/2023: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/03/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/03/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

LIS PENDENS

03/03/2023: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

03/03/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

AMENDED LIS PENDENS

03/15/2023: AMENDED LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

03/21/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/21/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: AUDRA O. NALLEY 3/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEFT: CHRISTOPHER NALLEY- 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Nalley, Audra O; Defendant: Nalley, Christopher;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Nalley, Audra O; Defendant: Nalley, Christopher; Plaintiff: Amerihome Mortgage Company LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less