This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 05:50:23 (UTC).

AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS vs GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3553

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS A/A/O GABE ARZUAGA

3307 Home Court

Tampa, FL 33611

AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

3307 Home Court

Tampa, FL 33611

ARZUAGA, GABE

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr

Attorney at ROBERT MACKINNON LAW, PA

3307 Home Ct

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant Attorney

VASQUEZ , MILLIANY A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY (GEICO)

4300 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/20/2022: AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT

05/20/2022: EXHIBIT

INTERROGATORIES

05/20/2022: INTERROGATORIES

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/20/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2022: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/09/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: AS PER AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GLASS PROFESSIONALS A/A/O AMY BALDWIN is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr