This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2020 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs WESTBROOK, EDWIN

Case Summary

On 12/24/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESTBROOK, EDWIN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2488

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

9550 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Defendant

WESTBROOK, EDWIN

Tampa, FL 33634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DISALLE , LISA

Attorney at AMERICAN EXPRESS LEGAL

9550 Regency Square Blvd Ste 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/13/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2019: E-FILED PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

05/23/2019: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2019: E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/27/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/24/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/24/2018: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/24/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY GENERAL DOCUMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: EDWIN WESTBROOK, 7/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PLURIES SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN; Date Served: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 Lisa.DiSalle@aexp.com; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: ALIAS SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 Lisa.Disalle@aexp.com ; courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Comment: (ALIAS) DEFT EDWIN WESTBROOK; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: EDWIN WESTBROOK; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 Lisa.Disalle@aexp.com ; courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ; Additional Info: Defendant: WESTBROOK, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less