Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/03/2019 at 10:57:28 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7910

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK

Defendants

THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY

235 West Brandon Blvd Unit 184

Brandon, FL 33511

MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A

Riverview, FL 33578

Garnishee

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MODLIN , SCOTT E, Esquire

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

MODLIN , SCOTT ERIC

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

MORNEAULT , MITCHELL ROSAIRE

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY P. A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/10/2019: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

08/06/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

07/22/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

07/18/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

07/18/2019: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/28/2019: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/26/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/31/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/31/2019: COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Garnishee: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Comment: (( CLERKS )) OF DEFT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION TO PLTFS ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A; Garnishee: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 10/24/2019 GARNIASHEE NAVY FEDERAL CRU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK; Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: pleadings@lssmlaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A; Defendant: THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY; Garnishee: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: WOCGI pleadings@lssmlaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A; Defendant: THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A; Defendant: THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY; Garnishee: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A; Defendant: THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MICHAEL A MAHOVLIC, 3/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: MAHOVLIC, MICHAEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: THE BRANDON MARTINI COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019396745; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Navy Federal Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORNEAULT, MITCHELL