This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/12/2021 at 00:38:29 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs RODRIGUEZ, MYKOANGELO

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, MYKOANGELO. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6966

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, MYKOANGELO

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN , SCOTT ERIC

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/22/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: STEVE ARMAS, OCTOBER 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: RODRIGUEZ, MYKOANGELO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric