This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/01/2021 at 11:55:35 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Liao, April

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Liao, April. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3206

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

9550 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Defendant

Liao, April

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNURR , JOSHUA JAMES

Attorney at MR. JOSHUA JAMES KNURR

179 Springline Dr

Vero Beach, FL 32963

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

10/13/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 11/03/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: APRIL LIAO A/K/A APRIL K LIAO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Liao, April

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knurr, Joshua James