This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 11:43:42 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Langrell, Robert

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Langrell, Robert. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5623

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

P.O. Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

Defendant

Langrell, Robert

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOGG , ERIK

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P.C.

Po Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/13/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ROBERT LANGRELL 09/01/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTY IN COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Langrell, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOGG, ERIK