This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/11/2021 at 13:44:46 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Johnson Butler, Jocelyn

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnson Butler, Jocelyn. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1423

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

9550 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Defendant

Johnson Butler, Jocelyn

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNURR , JOSHUA JAMES

Attorney at MR. JOSHUA JAMES KNURR

179 Springline Dr

Vero Beach, FL 32963

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON , LEONARD WELLESLEY, Jr

Po Box 1295

Minneola, FL 34755

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/25/2021: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

06/25/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Butler, Jocelyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Butler, Jocelyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07-22-21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Butler, Jocelyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKSON LEONARD W