This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/09/2021 at 19:40:20 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Hathaway, Charity

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hathaway, Charity. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1424

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

9550 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Defendant

Hathaway, Charity

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNURR , JOSHUA JAMES

Attorney at MR. JOSHUA JAMES KNURR

179 Springline Dr

Vero Beach, FL 32963

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/25/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 08-04-21 / CHARITY HATHAWAY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hathaway, Charity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knurr, Joshua James