This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 10:08:28 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Dina, Sabrina

Case Summary

On 07/17/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dina, Sabrina. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8074

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

P.O. Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

Defendant

Dina, Sabrina

Valrico, FL 33596

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN , ASHLEY LUCIA

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C

Po Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Dina, Sabrina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SABRINA DINA 07/31/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Dina, Sabrina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY L BROWN