This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2021 at 01:30:42 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Busto, Jason

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Busto, Jason. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul L, Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5721

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

9550 Regency Square Blvd., Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Defendants

Busto Plumbing Corporation

1702 W Saint Louis Street

Tampa, FL 33607

Busto, Jason

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNURR , JOSHUA JAMES

Attorney at MR. JOSHUA JAMES KNURR

179 Springline Dr

Vero Beach, FL 32963

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION

08/12/2021: STIPULATION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/10/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

07/09/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/09/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2021435077; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: BUSTO PLUMBING CORPORATION 7/26/2021 CORPORATE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Busto Plumbing Corporation; Defendant: Busto, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knurr, Joshua James