This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/03/2023 at 07:52:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs UDOTONG, ITA U

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UDOTONG, ITA U. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, A. Matthew, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Smith, Matthew. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0073

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, A. Matthew

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Smith, Matthew. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Express Bank, FSB,

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

UDOTONG, ITA U

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN , SCOTT ERIC

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/15/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/15/2022: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/16/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/16/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/10/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER

01/20/2023: ANSWER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/06/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: UDOTONG, ITA U; Date 2: 02/06/2023; Judicial Officer:: Smith, Matthew A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: & REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: UDOTONG, ITA U;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ITA U UDOTONG 1/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION V PER AO S-2022-032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UDOTONG, ITA U;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less