This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/16/2022 at 07:31:11 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9161

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as successor by mer

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendants

DESIR, FERDINAND

Riverview, FL 33579

THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC

5575 S. Semoran Blvd Suite 36

Orlando, FL 32822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN , SCOTT ERIC

Attorney at MODLIN SLINSKY, P.A.

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/02/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/02/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/03/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/03/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/29/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/02/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

ORDER

11/18/2021: ORDER

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/15/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

12/17/2021: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/22/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/07/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

12/07/2021: COURT TICKET

E-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

01/06/2022: E-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: DESIR, FERDINAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: Filer has been notified that the required summons fee must be paid before it can be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: FERDINAND DESIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC A/K/A 212 DESIR E GROUP R/A UNITED STATES CORPORATON AGENTS INC, NOVEMBER 24, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 11/18/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: THE 212 DESIR E GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: DESIR, FERDINAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric