This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/19/2023 at 05:13:38 (UTC).

AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE,Mayor, Lisandra Perez vs BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE,Mayor, Lisandra Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6863

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE

Mayor, Lisandra Perez

Defendant

BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

SUAREZ-ARIAS , CRISTINA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

03/24/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

MOTION IN LIMINE

11/15/2022: MOTION IN LIMINE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

SUPPLEMENTAL

11/15/2022: SUPPLEMENTAL

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/15/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/23/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; Additional Info: Defendant: BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO HAVE REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEEMED TIMELY FILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AMAZON FAMILY PRACTICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less