This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 05:01:20 (UTC).

Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually vs The Cato Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against The Cato Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, Emily. A and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2787

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

Fort Meyers, FL 33904

Defendants

The Cato Corporation

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Duce, Laura

Wesley Chapel, FL 33544

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTH , JOSEPH ROBERT

Attorney at THE NORTH LAW FIRM, P.A.

United Fidelity Bank Building 14241 Metro Pkwy Ste 200

Fort Myers, FL 33912

Defendant Attorney

RINE , JOHN AUSTIN

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/06/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/07/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/10/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/10/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/03/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/29/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/29/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

11/29/2021: DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

05/06/2021: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

05/06/2021: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/31/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/31/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/31/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/31/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: THIRD - OF TAKING DEPOSITION - 3/7/22 AT 1:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF TAKING DEPOSITION 01/10/2022 AT 10:30 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF TAKING DEPOSITION 01/10/2022 AT 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT; Additional Info: Date Signed: 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEFENSES OF; Additional Info: Defendant: Duce, Laura; Defendant: The Cato Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEFENSES OF; Additional Info: Defendant: Duce, Laura; Defendant: The Cato Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Duce, Laura; Defendant: The Cato Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alvin Hargrove Iv, By And Through His Parent And Next Friend, Angela Billings-Boswell, And Angela Billings Boswell, Individually

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cato Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rine, John Austin