Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/14/2020 at 06:21:55 (UTC).

Alverson, Craig A. vs Liberti, Brittney

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Alverson, Craig A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Liberti, Brittney. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4757

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alverson, Craig A.

Apollo Beach, FL 33572

Defendants

FCA US LLC

4300 S. Lapeer Rd.

Lake Orion, MI 48359

Liberti, Brittney

Bradenton, FL 34212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINO , ANTHONY DANIEL

Attorney at CLARK & MARTINO, P.A.

3407 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON , GREGORY ANDREW

Attorney at ANDERSONGLENN LLP

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32256

RUMKER , AMANDA

Attorney at ANDERSONGLENN LLP

10751 Deerwood Park Boulevard, Suite 105

Jacksonville, FL 32256

WHITNEY , NICHOLAS PRICE

Attorney at ANDERSONGLENN LLP

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32256

KING , COURTNEY MICHELLE

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS, P.A.

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

10/28/2020: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

09/24/2020: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/04/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/18/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/08/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/08/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/08/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/08/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/08/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

11/19/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/24/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11/04/2020: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/23/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/23/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/21/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/15/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/08/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/08/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJOINT MOTION; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 12/4/2020 @ 1000AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: FCA US LLC; Defendant: Liberti, Brittney

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alverson, Craig A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINO , ANTHONY DANIEL