This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 09:22:08 (UTC).

Ally Financial Inc. vs King, Jon E.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Ally Financial Inc filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against King, Jon E. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5862

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Financial Inc.

3575 Piedmont Road Ne Suite 500, Building 15

Atlanta, GA 30305

Defendant

King, Jon E.

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOLARO , ANDREW ROBERT

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/22/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

07/19/2021: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

07/16/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/22/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/16/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: evented on wrong case in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021368629; Judge: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: King, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: REPLEVIN FEE - efiling@aldridgepite.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: REPLEVIN FEE - efiling@aldridgepite.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW SCOLARO