This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/27/2021 at 17:34:36 (UTC).

ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC. vs UGARTE & ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UGARTE ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, A. Richard, Nielsen, Richard. A, Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8549

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, A. Richard

Nielsen, Richard. A

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

3901 Nw 115 Avenue

Miami, FL 33178

Defendants

HEES & ASSOCIATES, INC.

1381 Fifth Street

Sarasota, FL 34236

UGARTE & ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED

434 9Th Avenue W.

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BANDKLAYDER , DANIEL KEITH

Attorney at DANIEL K. BANDKLAYDER, P.A.

11130 Sw 88Th St Ste 104

Miami, FL 33176

Defendant Attorney

SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

10/30/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HEES & ASSOCIATES, INC.; Defendant: UGARTE & ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE; Additional Info: Defendant: HEES & ASSOCIATES, INC.; Defendant: UGARTE & ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: UGARTE & ASSOCIATES INC., 2/26/21, RA; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: HESS & ASSOICATES, INC., 2/26/21, CORPORATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 - danb@dkb-law.com ; irmat@dkb-law.com ; dougf@dkb-law.com; Additional Info: Defendant: HEES & ASSOCIATES, INC.; Defendant: UGARTE & ASSOCIATES, INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 - danb@dkb-law.com ; irmat@dkb-law.com ; dougf@dkb-law.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEE - danb@dkb-law.com ; irmat@dkb-law.com ; dougf@dkb-law.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: danb@dkb-law.com ; irmat@dkb-law.com ; dougf@dkb-law.com; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED NEW TECHNOLOGIES 2 INC is a litigant