Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/28/2020 at 16:45:28 (UTC).

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8040

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

SANTAMARIA, CARLOS

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

140 S. Atlantic Avenue

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

MILLER , CHANDRA LEE

Attorney at THOMPSON GOODIS

Goodis Thompson & Miller, P.A. Po Box 90

Saint Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/03/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

02/01/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/01/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019411055; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.; Plaintiff: SANTAMARIA, CARLOS; Private Attorney: MILLER , CHANDRA LEE; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 06/19/2019; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: (FIRST ) TO PLTFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA L MILLER, ESQ