This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2020 at 03:13:01 (UTC).

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. vs Security First Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Security First Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Oster, Cynthia and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3146

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Oster, Cynthia

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 603

Tampa, FL 33602

POLANCO, LAURA

Defendant

Security First Insurance Company

140 South Atlantic Avenue

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

MILLER , CHANDRA LEE

Attorney at THOMPSON MILLER

Goodis Thompson & Miller, P.A. Po Box 90

Saint Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/15/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/22/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM of Corp Rep of All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. (7/30/2020 @ 2:00PM); Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketORDER; Comment: CONSOLIDATING CASE NO. 19-CC-03146 INTO CASE NO. 18-CA-560; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company; Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Plaintiff: POLANCO, LAURA; Date 2: 05/12/2020; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED TO; Comment: (CIRCUIT CIVIL) CASE #18-CA-560 PER ORDER DTD 5/12/20 MCB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS; Comment: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE NO 19-CC-3146 INTO CASE #18-CA-560

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - 3/24/2020 @10AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less