This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/08/2019 at 12:36:47 (UTC).

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. vs Security First Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Security First Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2808

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

Fernandez Trial Firm, P.A. 100 S. Ashley Drive, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

PAYANO, RAMON

Defendant

Security First Insurance Company

Security First Insurance Company 140 S. Atlantic Avenue

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

MILLER , CHANDRA LEE

Attorney at THOMPSON GOODIS

Goodis Thompson & Miller, P.A. Po Box 90

Saint Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/27/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/25/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/21/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/19/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/19/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

02/19/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON PLTF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company; Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Plaintiff: PAYANO, RAMON; Date Signed: 07/29/2019; Judicial Officer: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: FIELD ADJUSTER DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW; Comment: PLAINTIFF;S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Security First Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less