Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/10/2020 at 09:36:46 (UTC).

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. vs HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, E. Jared and Costello, Jessica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7988

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, E. Jared

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

LUGO, JUAN

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 400

Sunrise, FL 33323

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH , MICHELLE LAUREN

Attorney at BAZINSKY, KORMAN & BAKER, P.A.

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 400

Sunrise, FL 33323

HALL , JONATHAN TODD

Attorney at HERITAGE INSURANCE

2600 Mccormick Dr Ste 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/22/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

05/15/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

CASE CONSOLIDATED TO

05/14/2020: CASE CONSOLIDATED TO

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/08/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

AGREED ORDER

10/22/2019: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/21/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/15/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

02/01/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/01/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 08/03/2020 10:30 AM EST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: ORDER CONSOLIDATING COUNTY COURT CASES NO.: 19-CC-7988 and 18-CC- 40642 INTO CASE NO. 17-CA-1842 (CONSLIDATED WITH CASE NO. 17-CA-1846 BY ORDER ON MARCH 11, 2020) 5/14/20 GPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED TO; Comment: CIRCUIT CASE #17-CA-1842 PER ORDER DTD 5/14/20 GPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS; Comment: "ORDER CONSOLIDATING COUNTY COURT CASES NO.: 19-CC-7988 and 18-CC- 40642 INTO CASE NO. 17-CA-1842 (CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NO. 17-CA-1846 BY ORDER ON MARCH 11, 2020) 5/14/20 GPH"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 08/03/2020 10:30 AM EST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: DFDT'S; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Date Signed: 10/21/2019; Judicial Officer: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL JONATHAN T

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , MICHELLE LAUREN