This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/18/2019 at 11:06:52 (UTC).

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. vs Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3148

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 603

Tampa, FL 33602

ZALDIVAR, YANELIS

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Po Box 19700

Jacksonville, FL 32245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

CHAPMAN , MARIA SOMERS

Attorney at APPLETON REISS, PLLC

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/18/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/08/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/22/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • PRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • AGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TORESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation; Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Plaintiff: ZALDIVAR, YANELIS; Private Attorney: CHAPMAN , MARIA SOMERS; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO PLAINITFFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019249236; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less