This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/26/2019 at 19:33:22 (UTC).

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. vs Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3255

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

Fernandez Trial Firm, P.A. 100 S. Ashley Drive, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

DELGADO, CARLOS

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation P.O. Box 19700

Jacksonville, FL 32245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

CHAPMAN , MARIA SOMERS

Attorney at APPLETON REISS, PLLC

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER

08/21/2019: AGREED ORDER

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/19/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/08/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED TO; Comment: CIRCUIT CASE #17-CA-1908 PER ORDER DTD 8/21/19 DMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketDO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS; Comment: CASE CONSOLIDATED INTO CIRCUIT CASE #17-CA-1908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER FOR PURPOSES OF CONSOLIDATION **GRANTED** - 17-CA-1908; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation; Date Signed: 08/21/2019; Judicial Officer: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DFDT'S- TO TRANSFER FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSOLIDATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation; Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Plaintiff: DELGADO, CARLOS; Private Attorney: CHAPMAN , MARIA SOMERS; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 03/30/2019; Judicial Officer: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY - FILED BY USAA CASUALTY INS - NAME DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: MARIA S SHAPMAN, ESQ; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less