Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/19/2019 at 05:31:14 (UTC).

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC vs AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8462

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

HASBUN, LEOPOLDO

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1101 E. Cumberland Ave.

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN , CURTIS LEE

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/18/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/09/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/05/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

02/05/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/05/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Plaintiff: HASBUN, LEOPOLDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING October 23rd, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. EST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • REPLY; Comment: TO RESPONCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 10/23/2019 @ 9:30 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Comment: MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Plaintiff: HASBUN, LEOPOLDO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: 4/30/2019 DEFT AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA