Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/27/2020 at 23:24:08 (UTC).

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. vs AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5944

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33602

GARZA, JUDITH

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1101 E. Cumberland Avenue

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN , CURTIS LEE

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/05/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/24/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/24/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

01/24/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/24/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/24/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED TO; Comment: (CIRCUIT) CASE 17-CA-10215 PER ORDER DATED 5/20/20 LAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS; Comment: ORDER Consolidating (COUNTY) Case No. 19-CC-5944 Into (CIRCUIT) Case No. 17-CA-10215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketORDER; Comment: Consolidating (COUNTY) Case No. 19-CC-5944 Into (CIRCUIT) Case No. 17-CA-10215; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.; Plaintiff: GARZA, JUDITH; Date 2: 05/20/2020; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Comment: PTC 8/7/20 @ 10:00 AM - JURY TRIAL 8/24/20 @ 9:00 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.; Plaintiff: GARZA, JUDITH; Private Attorney: ALLEN , CURTIS LEE; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 04/27/2020; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketORDER OF NOTIFICATION; Comment: REGARDING COURT'S INTENT TO RULE ON PENDING MOTION; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.; Plaintiff: GARZA, JUDITH; Private Attorney: ALLEN , CURTIS LEE; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 04/14/2020; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Comment: - AND, FOR AWARD OF ALL REASONABLE EXPENSES INCURRED PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.380(a)(4) (JUDITH GARZA); Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Comment: - AND, FOR AWARD OF ALL REASONABLE EXPENSES INCURRED, PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.380(a)(4) (CONTENDER CLAIMS CONSULTANTS, INC.); Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Curtis Lee