This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/23/2019 at 14:27:31 (UTC).

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc. vs American Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Oster, Cynthia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3099

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Oster, Cynthia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

100 S. Ashley Drive Suite 603

Tampa, FL 33602

VALDES, OBED

Defendant

American Security Insurance Company

P.O. Box 740252

Atlanta, GA 30339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

Attorney at FERNANDEZ TRIAL FIRM

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600 Unit 603

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

RAMOS , ANDREA M.

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, P.A.

401 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 2000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/18/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/22/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • NOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: AGREED; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/03/2019; Judicial Officer: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF SIMILAR CASES; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • AGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFT'S MOTON FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT - GRANTED; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company; Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.; Plaintiff: VALDES, OBED; Private Attorney: RAMOS , ANDREA M.; Private Attorney: SHERER , LATERRIA SHAUNDRIA; Date Signed: 03/18/2019; Judicial Officer: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: American Security Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Insurance Restoration Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less