This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/10/2022 at 09:36:25 (UTC).

All Auto Glass Corporation vs Infinity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 All Auto Glass Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Infinity Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1371

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR, ARMANDO

All Auto Glass Corporation

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

AUTO GLASS DORAL

Defendant

Infinity Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant Attorney

MCDANIEL , BRANDEN VINCENT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSO

3060 E College Ave # 105

Ruskin, FL 33570

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/13/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022383179; Judge: Lopez, Susan S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: All Auto Glass Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO GLASS DORAL is a litigant

Latest cases where All Auto Glass Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM