Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/06/2020 at 15:08:19 (UTC).

Ali Kalantar vs Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Ali Kalantar filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Heritage Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8008

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maritza Kalantar

Orlando, FL 32801

Ali Kalantar

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

C/O Florida Cfo As Ra 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HATFIELD , ROGER A

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN, P.A.

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

ORTIZ FIGUEROA , PEDRO M.

Attorney at IN-HOUSE LEGAL DEPT. HERITAGE INSURANCE

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33323

HALL , JONATHAN TODD

Attorney at HERITAGE INSURANCE

2600 Mccormick Dr Ste 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/07/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/01/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/01/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/01/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CORRESPONDENCE

02/01/2019: CORRESPONDENCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Comment: UNVERIFIED; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL DISCOVERY IS GRANTED; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Date Signed: 11/14/2019; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Date Signed: 08/27/2019; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali Kalantar; Plaintiff: Maritza Kalantar

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROGER HATFIELD