Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/16/2019 at 08:36:11 (UTC).

Ali, Abdul vs Viyulie, Sabhash

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Ali, Abdul filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Viyulie, Sabhash. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1269

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seeram, Karen

Tampa, FL 33647

Ali, Abdul

Tampa, FL 33647

Defendants

Viyulie, Meena

Riverview, FL 33569

Viyulie, Sabhash

Riverview, FL 33569

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSINA , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at HALE AND MESSINA LAW, PLLC

9735 Us Highway 19

Port Richey, FL 34668

Defendant Attorney

LIROT , LUKE CHARLES

Attorney at LUKE CHARLES LIROT, P.A.

2240 Belleair Rd Ste 190

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/25/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FILING

02/14/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

AMENDED LIS PENDENS

02/05/2019: AMENDED LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

02/05/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

02/05/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/04/2019: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

02/04/2019: LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS

02/04/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/04/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: DFDTS'- SUPPLEMENTAL TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: DEFENDANTS - UNOPPOSED TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - SUBHASH VIYULIE, 2/7/19 - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • AMENDED LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen; Vol./Book: 26391, Page: 1807, Number of Pages: 1807

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash; Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen; Vol./Book: 26392, Page: 591, Number of Pages: 591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash; Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen; Vol./Book: 26392, Page: 497, Number of Pages: 497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 anthony@halemessinalaw.com ; lindsey@halemessinalaw.com ; deborah@halemessinalaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Viyulie, Meena; Defendant: Viyulie, Sabhash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 anthony@halemessinalaw.com ; lindsey@halemessinalaw.com ; deborah@halemessinalaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ali, Abdul; Plaintiff: Seeram, Karen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESSINA , ANTHONY JOSEPH