This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/31/2021 at 06:44:11 (UTC).

Alhamedi, Marcia vs Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Alhamedi, Marcia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Holder, P. Gregory, Holder, Gregory. P and Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9367

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Holder, P. Gregory

Holder, Gregory. P

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alhamedi, Marcia

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendants

Fresenius Medical Care of North America

920 Winter Street

Waltham, MA 02451-1457

Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

920 Winter Street

Waltham, MA 02451-1457

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS , KIM EDWIN

Attorney at WELLS LAW GROUP

3626 Erindale Dr

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON , MICHELLE ILENE

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

201 Saint Charles Ave Ste 3710

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

01/05/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/05/2021: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/18/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

12/08/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/18/2020: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/08/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LETTER TO

12/09/2020: LETTER TO

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/02/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/01/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/01/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/01/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

12/01/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/01/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOT ATTACHED - VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE OF NORTH AMERCIA C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, 12/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: ALIAS SUMMONS - kwells@thewellslawgroup.com ; mconover@thewellslawgroup.com ; rwells@thewellslawgroup.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holding, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alhamedi, Marcia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESINIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDING INC. is a litigant