Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/30/2021 at 05:41:20 (UTC).

Alfonso, Ramon, Jr vs Walek, Stuart Allan

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Alfonso, Ramon, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Walek, Stuart Allan. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, C.. Carl and Hinson, Carl. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3505

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, C.. Carl

Hinson, Carl. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Walek, Vanisakorn

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688

Walek, Stuart Allan

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAIR , MOLLIE A.

Attorney at DENNIS HERNANDEZ & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

3339 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

HAAS , RAYMOND A

Attorney at HD LAW PARTNERS

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

FORD , TERRY SCHUYLER

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

SCHEELE , BRANDON ROBERT

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/27/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/27/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/27/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/27/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/27/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 07/23/21 JMB; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn; Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr; Private Attorney: HAAS , RAYMOND A; Private Attorney: HAIR , MOLLIE A.; Date Signed: 07/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Alfonso, Ramon, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Walek, Stuart Allan; Defendant: Walek, Vanisakorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORD , TERRY SCHUYLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEELE, BRANDON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A