This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/19/2021 at 01:05:11 (UTC).

ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH vs ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard, Weis, Richard. A and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6428

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

Plant City, FL 33565

Respondent

ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU

Plant City, FL 33565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FINAL INJUNCTION, FINAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU; Date Served: 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH CHILDREN; Comment: 5 YEARS-EXPIRES 5/25/2026; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH; Respondent: ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU; Date Signed: 05/25/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU; Date Served: 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PFIN-PETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH; Respondent: ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU; Date Signed: 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: TIWC-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: SERVICE PACKET; Additional Info: Respondent: ROBLERO VASQUEZ, CARLOS ESAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: ALFARO ESPINOSA, MAYRA JUDITH

    Read MoreRead Less