This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:18:23 (UTC).

Albunduqee, Ahmed vs Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Albunduqee, Ahmed filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer X, Gabbard, X. Jennifer and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9828

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albunduqee, Ahmed

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

1110 West Commercial Blvd Suite 305

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIPPS , ROBERT

Attorney at KEMP RUGE & GREEN LAW GROUP

11567 Trinity Blvd

New Port Richey, FL 34655

Defendant Attorney

VARGAS , CAROLAY

Attorney at GROELLE & SALMON ATTORNEYS AT LAW

1715 N West Shore Blvd Ste 320

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/23/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/23/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/23/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/23/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/13/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/15/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- 11/30/2022; Additional Info: Private Attorney: NIPPS , ROBERT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Albunduqee, Ahmed;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARGAS, CAROLAY