This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 22:45:33 (UTC).

AJ THERAPY, INC., vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 AJ THERAPY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1571

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AJ THERAPY CENTER OF TAMPA

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

AJ THERAPY, INC.,

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

LOPEZ DEL POZO, MARGARITA D.

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN , DEREK WILLIAM

Attorney at BERNSTEIN LAW

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

DOUMAS , JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/10/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/10/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/12/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

11/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST

11/10/2021: REQUEST

REQUEST

11/10/2021: REQUEST

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/12/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/21/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/06/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/06/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/06/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/06/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AJ THERAPY, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AJ THERAPY CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant