This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/01/2021 at 00:31:18 (UTC).

AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I vs BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY CORP

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY CORP. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Manning, M. Daryl, Manning, Daryl. M, Scott, M. Monique, Scott, Monique. M and Manning, Daryl M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9780

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Manning, M. Daryl

Manning, Daryl. M

Scott, M. Monique

Scott, Monique. M

Manning, Daryl M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I

Seffner, FL 33584

Defendants

BURLINGTON STORES INC

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY CORP

2006 Route 130 North

Burlington, NJ 08016

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE

11/06/2020: CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

10/28/2020: NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

COURT TICKET

10/26/2020: COURT TICKET

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

10/26/2020: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

ORDER

10/11/2020: ORDER

COPY OF

08/27/2020: COPY OF

COPY OF

09/23/2020: COPY OF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/21/2020: PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/21/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/21/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021065316; Judge: Scott, Monique M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Comment: AGREEMENT REACHED AT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION; Comment: 11/23/20 @ 1:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 300 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 10/26/2020; Judicial Officer: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 10/11/2020; Judicial Officer: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: CERT MAIL SIGNATURE; Additional Info: Defendant: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AGOSTINI MIRANDA, GLENDA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant