This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 01:34:06 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC,HATHAWAY, ALYSSA vs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 AFO IMAGING, INC,HATHAWAY, ALYSSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1452

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING, INC D/B/A ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING, INC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

HATHAWAY, ALYSSA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ , JOANNA

Attorney at MRS. JOANNA HERNANDEZ

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

HOWARD , CHAD WILLIAM

Attorney at PROGRESSIVE PIP HOUSE COUNSEL

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/07/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNANDEZ , JOANNA