This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 11:23:25 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC,Mason, Timothy vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 AFO IMAGING, INC,Mason, Timothy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7025

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING, INC D/B/A ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING, INC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Mason, Timothy

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Attorney at TODD LANDAU, P.A.

4601 Sheridan St Ste 200

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

GOODE , JAIMEE ROBIN

Attorney at PROGRESSIVE PIP HOUSE COUNSEL

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landau, Todd A